judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1051-89
PD-1051-89
07/17/1989
PDR Case Type
ERVING, RICKY RONARD
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/20/1989FINAL DISPRefused
10/04/1989PDR DISPRefused
08/17/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
07/17/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/01/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
ERVING, RICKY RONARDApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)John H. Hagler
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn C. Vance
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-00362-CR
Aff 6-7-89
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court 5 of Dallas County
Dallas
Honorable PAT MCDOWELL
F87-89924-HL