judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1044-89
PD-1044-89
07/17/1989
PDR Case Type
BROOKS, ROBERT DOUGLAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/20/1989FINAL DISPRefused
10/04/1989PDR DISPRefused
08/17/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
07/17/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/01/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn Holmes
Brooks, Robert DouglasApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Walter P. Mahoney, Jr.
Court of Appeals Information:
13-88-00390-CR
Aff 5-25-89
13th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
262nd District Court
Harris
Honorable DOUG SHAVER
504626