judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 12-89-00176-CR
12-89-00176-CR
07/17/1989
Revocation of Probation
Casey, Roy D.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/18/1989
12/13/1989Mandate Issued
11/27/1989
11/09/1989
10/25/1989Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
10/25/1989No Description Available.Dismissed
10/25/1989Motion to dismiss disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/25/1989Case ready to be set
10/25/1989Submission
10/25/1989Submitted
10/09/1989Brief Filed
10/09/1989Motion to Dismiss Appeal Filed
09/28/1989Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
09/28/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/25/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/30/1989No Description Available.
08/16/1989
07/17/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/13/1989Judgment from the Trial Court
07/12/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/15/2014RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
12/18/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
145th District Court
Nacogdoches
2192-86-2
8 yrs tdc