judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 12-89-00175-CV
12-89-00175-CV
07/17/1989
Mandamus
Smith, Vodie, as Next Friend for Cedrick Johnson, a minor
Coats, Hon. W. E., Judge, et al
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/07/2015Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
08/28/1989
08/12/1989
07/28/1989Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
07/28/1989Motion for Leave to File DisposedOtherwise Disposed
07/28/1989Case ready to be set
07/28/1989Submission
07/28/1989Submitted
07/17/1989Motion for Leave to File
07/17/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/07/2015Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
7th District Court
Smith
Honorable Donald R. Ross
87-157-A-A