judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-8865
C-8865
07/17/1989
App Writ of Error
CITGO PETROLEUM CORPORATION
FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
10/17/1989Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedRespondent
10/12/1989Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/01/1989Reply to ResponseRespondent
07/17/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
11/10/1989Case StoredREHEARING OVERRULED
11/08/1989Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruled
10/19/1989Motion for Rehearing forwarded
10/17/1989Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed
10/12/1989Motion for Rehearing
09/27/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedAS AMENDED
08/09/1989Case forwarded to Court
08/09/1989No description available.
08/01/1989Reply to Response
07/17/1989Amended Application for Writ of ErrorNO M/L/F FILED
07/17/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
11/10/1989Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-00550-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
RULE 90, 04-06-89
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
160th District Court
Dallas
Honorable Mark Whittington
84-11536-H