judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-8860
C-8860
07/17/1989
See former TRAP 130(D)
JOHN DEERE COMPANY ET AL.
JACKLYN MAY ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/02/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
12/28/1989Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/10/1989Reply to ResponseRespondent
08/23/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/02/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
02/12/1990Record returned to Court of Appeals
02/07/1990Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruledREHEARING OVERRULED
01/04/1990Motion for Rehearing forwarded
12/28/1989Motion for Rehearing
12/13/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedAS AMENDED
10/12/1989Case forwarded to Court
10/12/1989No description available.
10/10/1989Reply to Response
09/08/1989Amended Application for Writ of Error
09/06/1989MET to file reply disposed ofFiling granted
08/23/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/16/1989Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.Filing grantedM/E/T TO FILE AMENDED APP GRANTED UNTIL SEPTEMBER 8, 1989.
08/16/1989Motion for Leave to File Amended Petition filed2ND M/L/F AMENDED APP
07/31/1989MET to file reply disposed ofFiling grantedDUE 30 DAYS OF SUP COURT FILING DATE
07/17/1989Extension of time to file app writ err disposed ofFiling granted
07/17/1989Extension of time to file app writ err filed7 CC REC'D/FORWARDED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
02/12/1990Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
10-88-00140-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
773 Sw2d 369, 05-18-89
10th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
278th District Court
Madison
Honorable Jerry A. Sandel
5470