judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-8863
C-8863
07/17/1989
App Writ of Error
WILLIAM E. BENNETT AND MARY C. BENNETT
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATED
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
10/10/1989Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedRespondent
10/02/1989Motion for RehearingPetitionerNOT A RULE 5, ENVELOPE ATTACHED
07/19/1989Reply to ResponseRespondent
07/17/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
01/03/1990Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks.OverruledPET'S MO PUBLICATION(J. HECHT N/S)
12/14/1989Letter Filed12 COPIES OF LETTER TO STATE BAR FROM JOHN B. HAWLEY, DATED 12-11-89
12/14/1989Miscellaneous MotionMOTION FOR PUBLICATION.
11/17/1989Record returned to Court of AppealsREHEARING OVERRULED
11/15/1989Motion for Rehearing - Disposedmotion for rehearing overruled. Justice___not sit(J. HECHT NOT SITTING.)
10/19/1989Motion for Rehearing forwarded
10/10/1989Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filed
10/02/1989Motion for RehearingNOT A RULE 5, ENVELOPE ATTACHED
09/13/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied with Justice not sitting.(JUSTICE HECHT NOT SITTING).
07/26/1989Case forwarded to Court
07/26/1989No description available.
07/19/1989Reply to Response
07/17/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
11/17/1989Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-00745-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
RULE 90, 04-13-89
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable PAT MCCLUNG
Trial Court Information
95th District Court
Dallas
Honorable Jesse Oliver
85-1463-D