judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1047-89
PD-1047-89
07/17/1989
PDR Case Type
WILLIAMS, ROSA MARIE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/10/1989FINAL DISPRefused
10/25/1989PDR DISPRefused
08/17/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
07/17/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/20/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
WILLIAMS, ROSA MARIEApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)William W. Burge
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn Holmes
Court of Appeals Information:
14-88-00121-CR
Aff 5-4-89
14th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
228th District Court
Harris
Honorable TED POE
489199