judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1046-89
PD-1046-89
07/17/1989
PDR Case Type
MUMPHREY, ARTHUR
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/17/1989RESPONSE FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/06/1989FINAL DISP/REHEARRefused
12/06/1989REHEAR DISPDENIED
11/09/1989REHEAR FILED
10/25/1989OPINION ISSDRefused
10/25/1989PDR DISPRefused
08/17/1989RESPONSE FILED
07/17/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/08/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
MUMPHREY, ARTHURApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)George E. Renneberg
STATE OF TEXASStatePeter C. Speers III
Court of Appeals Information:
09-88-00073-CR
Aff 6-22-89
9th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
359th District Court
Montgomery
Honorable JAMES H. KEESHAN
18,963