judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-89-00350-CV
04-89-00350-CV
07/19/1989
Mandamus/prohibition
Valero Energy Corporation and Ken Boggs, Relators
Honorable Carol R. Haberman, Respondent
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/11/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/11/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/08/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
09/01/1989Response to Motion Filed
08/03/1989Mot. EOT to file ___________ DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/01/1989Mot. EOT to file ____________ Filed
07/25/1989Motion f/l/file Mandamus DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/19/1989Writ of Mandamus Received
07/19/1989Motion f/l/file Mandamus Filed
07/19/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/11/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
166th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Carol R. Haberman
87-CI-06482
n/a