judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00746-CV
01-89-00746-CV
07/19/1989
Miscellaneous/other civil
Robert M. Malinowski
South Shore Harbour Development
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/09/1990Order enteredMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
06/09/1990Order enteredMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
09/12/1989Filing fee paid
07/27/1989Motion to ext. time to file bond disposedGrant motion
07/19/1989Motion to extend time to file bond
07/19/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/26/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppelleeJohn A. Buckley Jr.
StateAppellantPeggy S. Supak
StateAppellantHoward A. Lang
Trial Court Information
10th District Court
Galveston
125629