judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00670-CR
14-89-00670-CR
07/20/1989
Other Drug Possession
Easley, Roosevelt
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/24/1991Case stored
05/21/1991Mandate Issued
05/21/1991Mandate Issued
05/06/1991Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
04/03/1991Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
01/04/1991Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
12/21/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
12/06/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
11/21/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
11/21/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
10/10/1990Submitted
10/10/1990Submission
10/10/1990Submitted
09/13/1990Submission
06/01/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
06/01/1990Case ready to be set
06/01/1990Case ready to be set
05/17/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
05/09/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
04/12/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
04/06/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/12/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
02/08/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
02/02/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/11/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
12/29/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/07/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
12/07/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
12/01/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
11/29/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
11/24/1989Motion to abate DISPOSED - APP, STADENIED
11/20/1989No description available.
11/20/1989Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL
11/14/1989Motion to abate FILED - APP, STA
09/21/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
09/18/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
09/15/1989Transcript FILED
07/20/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/18/1989Date of Sentence
07/18/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantMary Conn
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasKimberly Aperauch Stelter
Trial Court Information
184th District Court
Harris
534,817
99 years TDC