Case Information: 38262 | |||
Short Caption: | BRUINGTON (MICHAEL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C172487 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/02/2001 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
08/02/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 01-13095 | |
08/02/2001 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 5/14/01 through 5/18/01. Court Reporter: Sharleen Nicholson. Filed in district court on: July 27, 2001. | 01-13096 | |
08/02/2001 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 3/13/01. Court Reporter: Joe D'Amato. Filed in district court on: July 27, 2001. | 01-13097 | |
08/21/2001 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order. Granting Telephonic Extension. Pursuant to a telephonic request received on August 16, 2001, court recorder Sharleen Nicholson shall have until August 29, 2001, to file and serve the rough draft transcripts. | 01-14189 | |
08/30/2001 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: May 14, 2001 through May 18, 2001. Court Reporter: Sharleen Nicholson. | 01-14698 | |
08/31/2001 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Certificate of Acknowledgment. | 01-14788 | |
08/31/2001 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 01-14789 | |
09/24/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Court reporter or recorder Joe D'Amato shall file the requested transcripts within 10 days of this order or show cause why he should not be sanctioned. The motion for an extension of time is granted. The fast track statement and appendix shall be filed and served within 30 days of this order. | 01-16028 | |
09/25/2001 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. from Joseph D'Amato requesting extension of time to file transcripts in case nos. 36909/38187/38262/38330/38392 - case are not consolidated. | 01-16186 | |
09/26/2001 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: March 13, 2001. Court Reporter: Joseph D'Amato. | 01-16199 | |
09/28/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. On September 25, 2001, court reporter Joseph A. D'Amato filed a letter, which this court elects to construe as a motion for an extension of time to file the requested transcripts in these appeals. The motion is granted. Mr. D'Amato shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file the requested transcripts in these appeals or show cause why Mr. D'Amato should not be sanctioned. No further extensions will be granted absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. Nos. 38187/38262/38330/38392-these cases are not consolidated. | 01-16354 | |
10/29/2001 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 01-18041 | |
11/06/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. filed October 29, 2001. Counsel for appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. | 01-18499 | |
11/27/2001 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File 22 Page Fast Track Statement. | 01-19861 | |
11/27/2001 | Fast Track Brief | Received Fast Track Statement. | 01-19863 | |
11/27/2001 | Appendix | Received Appendix. | 01-19864 | |
12/10/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for leave to file a fast track statement in excess of 10 pages, filed November 27, 2001. The clerk of this court shall file the fast track statement and appendix provisionally submitted on November 27, 2001. | 01-20632 | |
12/10/2001 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 01-19863 | |
12/10/2001 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 01-19864 | |
12/18/2001 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File 16 Page Fast Track Response. | 01-21296 | |
12/19/2001 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed December 18, 2001. The clerk shall file the 16-page fast track response received on December 18, 2001. | 01-21396 | |
12/19/2001 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 01-21299 | |
01/22/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. 'ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED.' NNP02-MS/RR/NB | 02-01378 | |
02/19/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 02-01568 | |
02/19/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/08/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 21, 2002. | 02-01568 |