judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS, AND V. C. BILBO, ET AL., V. C. BILBO v. CENTRAL FREIGHT LINES, ET AL.

Case: B-1324
B-1324
01/17/1969
Application for Writ of Error
RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS, AND V. C. BILBO, ET AL., V. C. BILBO
CENTRAL FREIGHT LINES, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/27/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/26/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/04/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
01/17/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/31/1969Response to Motion filed
03/27/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/26/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/04/1969Response to Petition
01/17/1969Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/17/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Railroad Commission of Texas, and V. C. Bilbo, et al.Petitioner
Central Freight Lines, et al.Respondent
V. C. BilboPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information