judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1071-89
PD-1071-89
07/20/1989
PDR Case Type
SPAGNA, MICHAEL A.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/28/1989FINAL DISPRefused
11/08/1989PDR DISPRefused
08/23/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
07/20/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/05/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn Holmes
Spagna, Michael A.Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Michael A. Spagna
Court of Appeals Information:
14-88-00515-CR
Aff 4-20-89
14th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
179th District Court
Harris
Honorable JIMMY JAMES
498688