judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1064-89
PD-1064-89
07/20/1989
PDR Case Type
MURRAY, HALLIE DONNELL, JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/10/1989FINAL DISPRefused
10/25/1989PDR DISPRefused
08/22/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
07/20/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/20/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
MURRAY, HALLIE DONNELLJR.Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)R. D. Rucker
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn C. Vance
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-00963-CR
Aff 6-26-89
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court 5 of Dallas County
Dallas
Honorable PAT MCDOWELL
F88-80698-RL