judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00737-CV
01-89-00737-CV
07/19/1989
Miscellaneous/other civil
Title Insurance Co. of Minnesota
N. Robert Norwood and Andrea Norwood
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/27/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
07/27/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
07/07/1990No petition for review or writ of error was filed
06/22/1990Motion for rehearing was not filed
06/07/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/07/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/24/1990Submitted
01/24/1990Submission
01/24/1990Submitted
12/08/1989Submission
10/30/1989Supplemental brief filed
10/06/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
10/06/1989Case ready to be set
10/06/1989Case ready to be set
09/18/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
09/14/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
08/29/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
08/04/1989Statement of facts filed
07/26/1989Filing fee paid
07/19/1989Transcript filed
07/19/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/03/1989Appeal bond filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/27/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppelleeHon. John W. Mara
StateAppellantRosa S. Silbert
StateAppellantSusan J. Taylor
Trial Court Information
Co Civil Ct at Law No 2
Harris
520666