judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00671-CR
14-89-00671-CR
07/20/1989
Sexual Abuse or Rape of Child
Stanley, Howard Eugene
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
02/05/1990Waiver of remaining time to file briefState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/04/1991Case stored
02/01/1991Mandate Issued
02/01/1991Mandate Issued
01/17/1991Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
12/12/1990Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
10/15/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
10/05/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
09/06/1990Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STAOVERRULED
08/23/1990Ext.time file Mtn.for Rehear.DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
08/23/1990Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA
08/23/1990Motion to substitute attorney DISPOSED-ANT,APEGRANTED
08/13/1990Ext.time file Mtn.for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,APP
08/10/1990Motion for rehearing RECEIVED - ANT,APE,PRO SE
08/10/1990Motion to substitute attorney FILED-ANT,APE
07/19/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
07/19/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
07/18/1990Submitted
07/18/1990Submission
07/18/1990Submitted
02/05/1990Case ready to be set
02/05/1990Waiver of remaining time to file brief
02/05/1990Case ready to be set
01/26/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/25/1990Motion to substitute attorney DISPOSED-ANT,APEGRANTED
01/18/1990Motion to substitute attorney FILED-ANT,APE
01/15/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/28/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
12/15/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/05/1989No description available.
11/02/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
11/02/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
10/24/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
10/24/1989Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL
10/16/1989No description available.
10/05/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
09/20/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
09/12/1989No description available.
09/08/1989Transcript FILED
07/20/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/17/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
07/13/1989Date of Sentence
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/04/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasCalvin A. Hartmann
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantH. William Johnson
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantHon. Mary K. Quinn
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationPRO SEMr. Howard Eugene Stanley
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
263rd District Court
Harris
527,608
10 years TDC