judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1072-89
PD-1072-89
07/21/1989
PDR Case Type
NGUYEN, TAN RANG
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/10/1989FINAL DISPRefused
10/25/1989PDR DISPRefused
08/23/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
07/21/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/20/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Nguyen, Tan RangApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Charles F. Baird
Michael B. Charlton
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn Holmes
Court of Appeals Information:
14-88-00246-CR
Aff 6-22-89
14th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
232nd District Court
Harris
Honorable A. D. AZIOS
434143