judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-89-00351-CR
04-89-00351-CR
07/19/1989
Other Drug Sale
Lamb, Craig Stephen
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/15/1991Mandate received by the trial court
01/14/1991Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
01/14/1991Mandate Issued
01/14/1991Mandate Issued
10/31/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/31/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/02/1990Submitted
10/02/1990Submission
10/02/1990Submitted
09/12/1990Submission
08/01/1990Case ready to be set
08/01/1990Brief Filed
08/01/1990Case ready to be set
07/27/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/26/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
06/13/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/11/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
05/16/1990Brief Filed
04/17/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/12/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
03/16/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/14/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
02/22/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/15/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
01/19/1990No Description Available.
11/14/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
11/13/1989No Description Available.
10/16/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
10/13/1989No Description Available.
09/18/1989No Description Available.Motion Granted in Part
09/15/1989No Description Available.
09/14/1989No Description Available.
07/19/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/17/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/17/1989Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/14/1991Case StoredCase stored
11/04/2016RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
25th Judicial District Court
Guadalupe
Honorable Fred Moore
87-08-751-CR
20 years TDC