judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-89-00254-CR
07-89-00254-CR
07/20/1989
Burglary
Medley, Douglas Eugene
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/06/1990Mandate Issued
02/14/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/29/1989Case ready to be set
10/04/1989Motion for extension of time to file brief filedGRANT
10/02/1989Brief Filed
08/28/1989Clerk`s Record and Reporter's Record Filed
07/20/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/20/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/06/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
31st District Court
Roberts
Honorable David Wesley Gulley
650