judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-8877
C-8877
07/20/1989
App Writ of Error
SAN MARCOS CONSOLIDATED INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT
VALERO TRANSMISSION COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/25/1989Reply BriefRespondentOBJECTION AND ARGUMENT IN REPLY TO SUPPLEMENTAL APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ERROR
08/07/1989Reply to ResponseRespondent
07/20/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
07/16/1990Record returned to Court of AppealsNO REHEARING FILED
06/06/1990Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedAS SUPPLEMENTED
06/06/1990m/l/f to file supplemental application disposedFiling granted
06/06/1990supp to app writ error
09/25/1989Reply BriefOBJECTION AND ARGUMENT IN REPLY TO SUPPLEMENTAL APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ERROR
08/30/1989m/l/f to supp app writ error
08/30/1989supp to app writ error
08/09/1989Case forwarded to Court
08/09/1989No description available.
08/07/1989Reply to Response
07/20/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
07/16/1990Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
03-88-00186-CV
Reversed & Remanded
770 SW2d 648, 05-24-89
3rd Court of Appeals
Honorable JOHN POWERS
Trial Court Information
22nd District Court
Hays
Honorable Charles R. Ramsay
2703