judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00863-CV
05-89-00863-CV
07/20/1989
Other Personal Injury
Baucom, Emory
Pearle Vision Center, Texas State Optical, Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
12/09/1997Record RetentionDestroy
08/16/1990Mandate Issued
08/16/1990Mandate Issued
06/20/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/20/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/25/1990Response to Motion
05/23/1990Mot.-Ext. File Sup Brief DispMotion or Writ Denied
05/17/1990Mot. for Ext. File Sup. Brief
05/11/1990Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/08/1990Motion for Leave to File
05/08/1990Submission
05/08/1990Submitted
05/08/1990Submission
05/08/1990Submitted
05/07/1990Supplemental Transcript filed
04/23/1990Letter Filed
03/21/1990MattConv
12/01/1989Brief Filed
12/01/1989Case ready to be set
12/01/1989Case ready to be set
11/30/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.
11/29/1989Supplemental Transcript filed
11/16/1989Brief Filed
11/16/1989Case ready to be set
11/16/1989Response to Motion
11/13/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/30/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/17/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/16/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/13/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/22/1989Brief Filed
08/22/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/18/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/24/1989MattConv
07/20/1989Transcript Filed
07/20/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/21/1989Appeal Bond Filed
05/23/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
116th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Frank Andrews
84-7516-F