judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00739-CR
01-89-00739-CR
07/20/1989
Habeas Corpus
Davis, Emmitt Roy
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/07/1989Mandate issued - criminal or civil
09/07/1989Opinion issuedDismissed
09/07/1989Opinion issuedDismissed
09/07/1989Mandate issued - criminal or civil
08/01/1989Transcript filed
07/28/1989Motion to dismiss appeal
07/20/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/17/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
07/17/1989Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/07/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
StateCriminal - AppellantJudy Ritts
Trial Court Information
338th District Court
Harris
534,689