judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00854-CR
05-89-00854-CR
07/20/1989
Other Drug Possession
Roberson, Wanda Mae
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/19/2000Record RetentionDestroy
08/22/1990Mandate Issued
08/22/1990Mandate Issued
06/21/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/21/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/23/1990Submission
05/23/1990Submitted
05/23/1990Submission
05/23/1990Submitted
03/12/1990MattConv
03/06/1990Submission
02/14/1990Letter Sent by the Court
01/25/1990MattConv
10/10/1989Brief Filed
10/10/1989Case ready to be set
10/10/1989Case ready to be set
09/22/1989Brief Filed
09/22/1989Letter Filed
08/22/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/21/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/27/1989Statement of Facts Filed
07/20/1989Transcript Filed
07/20/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/31/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
05/31/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/22/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
59th Judicial District Court
Grayson
Honorable Lloyd Perkins
34,691
6 yrs Prob. & $5,000 Fine