judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-89-00163-CV
02-89-00163-CV
07/20/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Thomas, Carolyn
Winnett, Rodman J.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/31/1990Case stored
12/13/1989Writ DisposedDismissed
10/06/1989Writ Filed
09/18/1989Case stored
08/30/1989Opinion issuedDismissed
08/11/1989Response Filed
08/03/1989Civil Notice to Dismiss-No Appellant's Brief Filed
08/02/1989No Description Available.
08/02/1989Extension to File Bond Filed for Original Proceed
08/02/1989Other Document Received
08/02/1989Request for Extension of Recorder's Record DisposdMotion or Writ Denied
08/02/1989Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/02/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Denied
08/02/1989Response Filed
08/02/1989Other Document Received
07/31/1989Response Filed
07/31/1989Response Filed
07/31/1989Other Document Received
07/26/1989No Description Available.
07/21/1989Motion Filed
07/20/1989Other Document Received
07/20/1989Extension to File Bond Filed for Original Proceed
07/20/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/31/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 1
Tarrant
Honorable Virgil Vahlenkamp
87-20636-3