judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-89-00164-CV
02-89-00164-CV
07/20/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Henry, Donald and Patricia Henry McAfee
Thompson, Billy Randle, a/k/a Randy Thompson
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/16/1990Mandate Issued
02/28/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/09/1990Order Entered
01/09/1990Submitted
01/09/1990Submission
09/28/1989Submission
09/01/1989Brief Filed
09/01/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/31/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
07/20/1989Submission
07/20/1989No Description Available.
07/20/1989No Description Available.
07/20/1989No Description Available.
07/20/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/16/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 1
Denton
Honorable Fred W. Davis
88-14154-B