judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RODRIGUEZ VS. SUAREZ

Case Information: 38261
Short Caption:RODRIGUEZ VS. SUAREZCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0000724Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/21/2001How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/02/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/02/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-13083
08/14/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn3[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 01-13794
08/21/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. 01-14164
08/21/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/11/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02Y-CY/DA/ML 01-17121
11/07/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal this day. 01-17331
11/07/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/15/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 9, 2001. 01-17331