judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: BERNARD BETTIS, ET AL

Case Information: 10-CV-1443
Short Caption:IN RE: BERNARD BETTIS, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAM8755-06Filed Date:11/15/2010

Opening Event Date:11/15/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/03/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:03/18/2011
Argued/Submitted:10/06/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/10/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantBernard Bettis NPro SeN
AppellantDonald L. Mcclure NPro SeN
AppelleeSharon Marbury N
Roy L. MasonNN
Cawood Robert B YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/15/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/18/2010APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION to preserve the status and rights of the parties by court of appeals App. R. 8 (b)(1), case law and statutes applicable to trial judge's order promulgated on 10/27/10 *****CONSTRUED AS A MOTION FOR STAY & FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL LW
11/19/2010TMC - appellant's MISC motion
12/03/2010 ORDERED that APPELANTS' MOTION FOR STAY IS DENIED as appellants do not meet the standard necessary to grant a stay. See Barry v. Washigton Post Co., 529 A.2d 319, 321 (DC 1987). It is FURTHER ORDERED that the MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL of the trial court's denial of their motion to recuse IS DENIED. See Oliver T. Carr Mgm't INc. v. Nat'l Deli INc. 397 A.2d 914, 915 (DC 1979)... (KROBFA) (cb)
12/03/2010RECORD INDEX
12/03/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/07/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on November 15, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellants shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellants must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellants must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellants' failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
12/14/2010NOTICE RECEIVED- from aplt re: court order
12/21/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 6/17/09, 11/18/09, 1/11/08,2/1/08 & 10/27/10) (elp)
01/13/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellants' brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
02/22/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
02/22/2011APPENDIX
03/03/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
03/08/2011TMC - appellee's motion to dismiss - oppo - motion to file (LODGED) reply brief - oppo
03/11/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION- to aple's motion to dismiss appeal
03/18/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
03/18/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/24/2011FiledFinal Screening-Summary
04/18/2011RECEIVED- aplt's reply brief (motion needed)
04/20/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF
04/27/2011APPELLEE'S ANSWER/RESPONSE-to aplt's motion for extension of time Roy Mason, Esq.
05/23/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE the lodged reply brief IS GRANTED and the Clerk shall file the reply brief. It is ****MORE****
05/23/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that the MOTION TO DISMISS IS REFERRED TO THE MERITS DIVISION once assigned. (RZTHPR)
05/23/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
06/28/2011CHANGE OF ADDRESS RECEIVED Roy Mason
09/01/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/06/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Fisher, Blackburne-Rigsby, Steadman
03/14/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher and Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judges, and Steadman, Senior Judge.)
03/28/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant Bettis, Appellant Mcclure)
08/31/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc.
09/10/2012FiledMandate