judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF SAN MARCOS, ET AL. v. SAVINGS AND LOAN COMMISSIONER OF TEXAS AND AUSTIN SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION

Case: B-1323
B-1323
01/17/1969
Application for Writ of Error
FIRST FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF SAN MARCOS, ET AL.
SAVINGS AND LOAN COMMISSIONER OF TEXAS AND AUSTIN SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/05/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/24/1969Letter brief Respondent
02/25/1969Response to Reply filedRespondent
02/13/1969Reply to ResponsePetitioner
02/03/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
01/17/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/10/1969Response to Motion filed
06/05/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/24/1969Letter brief
02/25/1969Response to Reply filed
02/13/1969Reply to Response
02/03/1969Response to Petition
01/17/1969Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/17/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
First Federal Savings and Loan Association of San Marcos, et al.Petitioner
Savings and Loan Commissioner of Texas and Austin Savings and Loan AssociationRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information