judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00853-CR
05-89-00853-CR
07/20/1989
Sexual Abuse, Rape or Injury of a Child
Karnes, Jr., Noah Charles
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/19/2000Record RetentionRetain
07/19/1991Letter filed
10/29/1990Mandate Issued
10/29/1990Mandate Issued
10/08/1990Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
10/08/1990Case Returned from Higher Ct.
05/02/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FiledRefused
04/03/1990Letter filed
04/02/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/02/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/07/1990Submission
03/07/1990Submitted
03/07/1990Submission
03/07/1990Submitted
03/06/1990Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/05/1990Motion for Leave to File
01/25/1990MattConv
10/23/1989Brief Filed
10/23/1989Case ready to be set
10/23/1989Case ready to be set
09/26/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/25/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/28/1989Brief Filed
07/27/1989Statement of Facts Filed
07/24/1989Transcript Filed
07/20/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/02/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
05/26/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/29/1990Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
59th Judicial District Court
Grayson
Honorable Lloyd Perkins
36,858
15 yrs TDC