judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1063-89
PD-1063-89
07/20/1989
PDR Case Type
HARVEY, JOHN WALLACE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/20/1989FINAL DISPRefused
10/04/1989PDR DISPRefused
08/22/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
07/20/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/01/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
HARVEY, JOHN WALLACEApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Walter C. Prentice
STATE OF TEXASStateRonald Earle
Court of Appeals Information:
03-88-00039-CR
Ref & Aff 5-10-89
3rd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
167th District Court
Travis
Honorable Bob Jones
88,642