judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-89-00184-CR
10-89-00184-CR
07/20/1989
Felony DWI
Alvin R. Miller
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/01/2019Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
12/17/1993Case stored
12/17/1993Mandate issued by this Court
12/01/1993Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
05/15/1991Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsMotion or Writ Granted
03/07/1991Petition for discretionary review filed
02/07/1991Motion for Rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/31/1991Motion for extension of time to file rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/21/1991No Description Available.
01/14/1991Motion for extension of time to file rehearing
12/27/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/07/1990No Description Available.
08/07/1990No Description Available.
08/07/1990Case ready to be set
06/14/1990No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
06/14/1990No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
06/13/1990No Description Available.
06/13/1990No Description Available.
04/19/1990No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
04/17/1990No Description Available.
03/20/1990No Description Available.
03/13/1990No Description Available.
02/22/1990No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
02/20/1990No Description Available.
01/25/1990Motion to abate disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/22/1990No Description Available.
01/18/1990No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
01/12/1990No Description Available.
12/18/1989No Description Available.
09/28/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
09/22/1989No Description Available.
09/14/1989No Description Available.
07/20/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/07/1989No Description Available.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/01/2019Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasPatrick S. Dohoney
Miller, Alvin R.AppellantFrank B. McGregor
Trial Court Information
County Court
Hill
Honorable Allen D. Place
M2412
30 days probated 24 months