judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-94-00182-CR
04-94-00182-CR
03/31/1994
Other Drug Possession
Hayes, James
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/21/2017Internal memo
07/21/1994Mandate Issued
07/21/1994Mandate Issued
05/25/1994Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/25/1994Motion to Withdraw Counsel Disposed
05/25/1994Motion to Withdraw Appeal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/25/1994Opinion issuedDismissed
05/25/1994Opinion issuedDismissed
05/09/1994Motion Filed
04/18/1994Motion to Withdraw Appeal Filed
04/12/1994No Description Available.
04/11/1994No Description Available.
04/08/1994Motion to Withdraw Counsel Filed
03/31/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/17/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
02/10/1994Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/21/2017Case StoredCase archived
07/21/2019RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasSteven C. Hilbig
Hayes, JamesCriminal - AppellantEdward Errol Chastain
James Hayes
Trial Court Information
226th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Sid L. Harle
93-CR-1501W
Six (6) yrs & $500. fine