judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-94-00114-CR
02-94-00114-CR
03/31/1994
All Misdemeanors
Puckett, Sherry Lee
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/20/1995Mandate Issued
11/02/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/29/1995Submitted
03/29/1995Submission
02/02/1995Submission
01/30/1995Supplemental Brief Filed
01/18/1995Brief Filed
01/18/1995Case ready to be set
10/31/1994Supplemental Brief Filed
10/26/1994Letter
10/25/1994Brief Filed
10/25/1994Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/24/1994Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
05/20/1994Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/19/1994Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
04/11/1994Criminal record or relator's record and/or exhibits
04/11/1994Submission
03/31/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
03/31/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/20/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasVincent Messina
Puckett, Sherry LeeCriminal - AppellantN. R. (Steve) Stevenson
Trial Court Information
County Court
Hood
Honorable Gregg D. Cleveland
22734
12 mo/Probation & $700 Fine