judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-94-00052-CR
10-94-00052-CR
03/31/1994
Other Drug Possession
Lejuanda Dinita Freeman
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/10/1994Case stored
10/10/1994Mandate issued by this Court
08/17/1994Opinion issuedDismissed
07/18/1994Motion to Dismiss filed
06/21/1994No Description Available.
04/01/1994No Description Available.
03/31/1994Notice of Appeal filed
03/31/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/10/2019Case StoredDestroy case in 25 years.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasBill R. Turner
Freeman, Lejuanda DinitaAppellantJim W. James
Trial Court Information
85th District Court
Brazos
Honorable Jimmy Don Langley
21,545-85