judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-94-00303-CV
14-94-00303-CV
03/31/1994
Mandamus/prohibition
Uni Storebrand, Et Al
Bianchi, Richard P., Judge of 333rd District Court, Harris
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/31/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
04/07/1994Misc motion DISPOSEDDENIED
04/06/1994Misc Motion filed
04/05/1994Submission
04/04/1994Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus DISPOSED-APP,REL,RESDENIED
04/04/1994Order EnteredGRANTED
04/04/1994Order withdrawn
04/04/1994Order EnteredGRANTED
04/01/1994Exhibits FILED
04/01/1994Response brief FILED-ANT,APE
03/31/1994Misc motion DISPOSEDGRANTED
03/31/1994Misc Motion filed
03/31/1994Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus DISPOSED-APP,REL,RESGRANTED
03/31/1994Order Entered
03/31/1994Petition for writ of mandamus FILED-REL,RES
03/31/1994Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA
03/31/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/30/1994Exhibits received
03/30/1994Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus FILED-APP,REL,RES
03/30/1994Petition for Writ of mandamus RECEIVED - REL
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/14/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentThomas R. McDade
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentJohn R. Pearson
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentCharles R. Dunn
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentHon. John A. Gilliam
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentJudge, 333rd District Court
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentJoseph D. Jamail
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRelatorEdward J. Murphy
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentRobert D. Allen
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentHon. Richard Mosher
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentHon. Kevin M. Murphy
Trial Court Information
333rd District Court
Harris
9125790-A