judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-94-00162-CR
13-94-00162-CR
03/31/1994
Other Felony
Quiroga, Samuel
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/24/1994Mandate Issued
09/08/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/31/1994Submitted
08/31/1994Submission
07/26/1994Submission
06/03/1994List of Parties
05/27/1994Brief Filed
05/27/1994Case ready to be set
05/27/1994Brief Does not Comply
05/27/1994No oral argument requested
04/28/1994Transcript Filed
04/26/1994Statement of Facts Filed
04/26/1994Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
04/26/1994Statement of Facts Received
03/31/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
03/31/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/24/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasHon. Luis V. Saenz
Quiroga, SamuelAppellantHon. Alfredo Padilla
Trial Court Information
103rd District Court
Cameron
Honorable Menton Murray
93-CR-1816-D
8 yrs. TDCJ-ID