judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-94-00161-CR
13-94-00161-CR
03/31/1994
Burglary
DeLeon, Annette
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/08/1994Mandate Issued
06/07/1994Certified Copy Filed
05/12/1994Opinion issuedDismissed
05/12/1994Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/03/1994Transcript Filed
04/28/1994Motion for Dismissal Filed
04/19/1994Certified Copy Filed
04/12/1994Certified Copy Filed
03/31/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
03/31/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/08/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasHon. Carlos Valdez
Deleon, AnnetteAppellantHon. James R. Lawrence
Trial Court Information
148th District Court
Nueces
Honorable Margarito Garza
86-CR-580-E
10 yrs TDCJ