judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-94-00188-CV
04-94-00188-CV
03/31/1994
Other Personal Injury
Delgado, Ernest & Flores, Mario
Bexar County; Bexar County D/B/A Bexar County Adult Detention Center; Bexar County D/B/A Bexar County Jail; Harlon Copeland; Officer Enriquez; & Omni Lifts, Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/23/1994Information regarding cause received
09/23/1994Information regarding cause received
09/20/1994Information regarding cause received
09/20/1994Information regarding cause received
09/13/1994Information regarding cause received
09/13/1994Information regarding cause received
09/09/1994Mandate Issued
09/09/1994Mandate Issued
08/08/1994Information regarding cause received
08/08/1994Information regarding cause received
08/08/1994Information regarding cause received
08/08/1994Information regarding cause received
07/29/1994Information regarding cause received
07/20/1994Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/20/1994Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/20/1994Opinion issuedDismissed
07/20/1994Opinion issuedDismissed
07/11/1994Information regarding cause received
07/11/1994Information regarding cause received
07/11/1994Information regarding cause received
07/11/1994Information regarding cause received
07/11/1994Information regarding cause received
06/30/1994Motion for Dismissal Filed
06/30/1994Motion for Dismissal Filed
06/24/1994Information regarding cause received
06/24/1994Information regarding cause received
06/22/1994Motion for Dismissal Filed
06/22/1994Motion for Dismissal Filed
06/20/1994Motion for Dismissal Filed
06/20/1994Motion for Dismissal Filed
05/26/1994Mot. EOT to file ___________ DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/26/1994Mot. EOT to file ___________ DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/26/1994Mot. EOT to file ___________ DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/26/1994Mot. EOT to file ___________ DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/26/1994Mot. EOT to file ___________ DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/26/1994Mot. EOT to file ___________ DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/23/1994Mot. EOT to file ____________ Filed
05/23/1994Mot. EOT to file ____________ Filed
05/23/1994Mot. EOT to file ____________ Filed
05/23/1994Mot. EOT to file ____________ Filed
05/04/1994Show cause hearing held
05/04/1994Show cause hearing held
05/04/1994Show cause hearing held
05/04/1994Show cause hearing held
03/31/1994No Description Available.
03/31/1994No Description Available.
03/31/1994No Description Available.
03/31/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/09/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ernest DelgadoAppellantErnest Delgado
Omni Lifts, Inc.AppelleeRebecca L. Humphrey
Bexar County, Et Al.AppelleeWade B. Shelton
Mario FloresAppellantMario Flores
Trial Court Information
57th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Charles A Gonzalez
91-CI-00347
N/A