judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 12-94-00088-CR
12-94-00088-CR
03/31/1994
Assault & battery
Criss, Frankie
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/16/1995
03/16/1995Case stored
03/13/1995Mandate Issued
02/23/1995
02/08/1995
01/24/1995Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
01/24/1995Opinion issuedOtherwise Disposed
01/04/1995Submitted
01/04/1995Submission
06/21/1994
06/08/1994Brief Filed
06/08/1994Case ready to be set
05/18/1994Brief Filed
05/04/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/04/1994Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
05/03/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/04/1994
03/31/1994No Description Available.
03/31/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
01/12/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
12/29/1993Motion For New Trial filed in trial court
12/03/1993
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/16/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasMr. Randy Sikes
Criss, FrankieCriminal - AppellantMr. Merrillie W. Maull
Trial Court Information
3rd District Court
Anderson
22902
5 yrs TDC