judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 12-94-00087-CV
12-94-00087-CV
03/31/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Guevara, Frank Ramirez
Guevara, Yolanda Martinez
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/18/2006Case has been destroyed/Records Retention Action
06/05/1995Notice Filed
04/20/1995
04/20/1995Case stored
04/18/1995Mandate Issued
03/30/1995
03/15/1995
02/28/1995Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
02/28/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/27/1995Submitted
02/27/1995Submission
08/25/1994
08/17/1994Case ready to be set
08/17/1994No Description Available.
08/08/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/08/1994Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
08/08/1994Response to Motion Filed
07/18/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/06/1994Letter from the Court
06/21/1994Letter from the Court
06/17/1994Case ready to be set
06/17/1994No Description Available.
06/13/1994Letter from the Court
05/23/1994Brief Filed
05/09/1994Letter from the Court
05/04/1994Motion to dismiss disposedOverruled
05/04/1994Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
04/29/1994Letter from the Court
04/25/1994Motion to Dismiss Appeal Filed
04/22/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ No Action Taken
04/22/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/22/1994Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
04/12/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/08/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/31/1994No Description Available.
03/31/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
02/11/1994Affidavit Filed.
12/30/1993Motion For New Trial filed in trial court
12/04/1993Order Entered
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/18/2006Case DestroyedCase Destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Guevara, Yolanda MartinezAppelleeFrank Ramirez Guevara
Guevara, Frank RamirezAppellantFrank Ramirez Guevara
Trial Court Information
3rd District Court
Anderson
Honorable Jerry L. Calhoon
36644