judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-94-00134-CR
09-94-00134-CR
03/31/1994
Assault or Attempted Murder
Guidry, Demond
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/05/1994Mandate Issued
12/05/1994MANDATE ISSUED FROM HIGHER COURT AND CASE STORED
10/19/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/12/1994Case ready to be set
10/12/1994Letter
10/12/1994Submitted
10/12/1994Submission
10/05/1994Letter
09/01/1994Order Entered
07/21/1994Order Entered
07/11/1994Brief Filed
07/11/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/11/1994Mt to Withdraw as attorney filed
06/09/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/06/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/10/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
05/10/1994Statement of Facts Filed
05/06/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
04/15/1994Transcript Filed
03/31/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
03/31/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/05/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Adams, JohnCourt reporterJohn R. Adams
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasRodney D. Conerly
Dillard, BeverlyDistrict or County ClerksDebbie Usoff
Guidry, DemondAppellantDemond Guidry
Douglas M. Barlow
Trial Court Information
252nd District Court
Jefferson
56110
8 years