judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-94-00160-CR
13-94-00160-CR
03/31/1994
All Misdemeanors
Lugaro, Uziel Mercado
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/25/1995Cite for opinions
09/14/1995Mandate Recd Ct Crim App / Dt. Clk
09/08/1995Mandate Issued
07/13/1995Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
04/13/1995Submitted
04/13/1995Submission
03/23/1995Panel change on case on SMIS or SMIT
02/06/1995Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
01/09/1995Brief Filed
01/09/1995No oral argument requested
01/06/1995Submission
12/01/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/18/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/10/1994Motion for leave to file brief DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Granted
11/10/1994Motion for leave to file SOF DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Granted
11/03/1994List of Parties
10/27/1994Case ready to be set
10/27/1994Statement of Facts Filed
10/27/1994Brief Filed
10/27/1994Brief Does not Comply
10/27/1994Motion for leave to file brief
10/27/1994Motion for Leave to File Statement of Facts
10/27/1994No oral argument requested
10/27/1994Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
10/27/1994Statement of Facts Received
10/21/1994Green card in
10/20/1994Motion for leave to file SOF DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Granted
10/18/199410 day letter sent
10/13/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
10/13/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/13/1994Motion for leave to file Supp. Trans. DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Granted
10/10/1994Motion for Leave to File Statement of Facts
09/27/1994STATEMENT OF FACTS FILED
09/27/1994Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
09/27/1994Statement of Facts Received
06/22/1994request for documents
06/15/1994Supplemental transcript recieved
06/02/1994Green card in
06/02/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/02/1994Motion for extension of time to file statement
06/02/1994Motion for leave to file supplemental transcript
05/27/199410 day letter sent
05/24/1994Supplemental transcript filed
05/24/1994Supplemental transcript recieved
05/05/1994Green card in
05/03/1994Letter sent to attorneys
04/14/1994Transcript Filed
04/11/1994Letter sent
04/06/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
03/31/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
03/31/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/08/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Lugaro, Uziel MercadoAppellantUziel Mercado Lugaro
M. P. 'Dexter' Eaves
Lugaro, Uziel MercadoCriminal - State of TexasGeorge J. Filley, Iii
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasDaniel F. Gilliam
Nicole E. Worsley
Trial Court Information
County Court
Victoria
Honorable Juan Velasquez
1-60,151
1 yr County Jail