judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-94-00164-CV
13-94-00164-CV
03/31/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Nicor Exploration Company, WADI/P V Limited Partnership, A.L. Ballard, and Leslie C. Ballard 1974 Trust
Florida Gas Transmission Company
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/22/1996Mandate Issued
10/18/1996Record returned to Court.
08/01/1996Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Denied
02/07/1996Cite for opinions
01/26/1996Application of Writ of Error sent to Supreme Court
01/08/1996Writ Filed
01/08/1996Writ of Error Fee Paid
12/21/1995Letter sent
12/08/1995Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
11/17/1995Motion for rehearing filed
11/02/1995Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
07/10/1995Address Change
05/15/1995Post submission brief filed
04/20/1995Submitted
04/20/1995Submission
03/31/1995Reply Brief Filed
02/06/1995Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
01/09/1995Submission
12/15/1994Reply Brief Filed
06/27/1994Brief Filed
06/27/1994Oral argument requested
06/23/1994Motion to Supplement DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/15/1994Filing Fee Paid
06/10/1994Supplemental transcript filed
06/10/1994Motion to supplement transcript
06/10/1994Supplemental transcript recieved
06/02/1994Brief Filed
06/02/1994Oral argument requested
06/01/1994Brief Filed
06/01/1994Case ready to be set
06/01/1994Oral argument requested
05/13/1994Green card in
05/12/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/12/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/11/1994Green card in
05/10/1994Green card in
05/05/1994Order Entered
05/02/1994Sworn Statement filed
04/28/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/26/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/14/1994Information requested by the court
04/14/1994Statement Filed
04/11/1994Statement Filed
04/08/1994Statement Filed
04/06/1994Filing Fee Paid
03/31/1994Transcript Filed
03/31/1994Transcript Received
03/31/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/22/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Florida Gas Transmission CompaAppelleeBerry D. Bowen
Christi L. Nicolay
Christopher W. Barnes
James E. Essig
Bert L. Huebner
Nicor Exploration Company, WadAppellantSusan K. Pavlica
William Pannill
William H. Knull, Iii
Lawrence P. Gwin, Jr.
Hon. Roy L. Barnes
Trial Court Information
23rd District Court
Matagorda
Honorable V. Neil Caldwell
93-C-0155-C