judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GOTTLIEB VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 38258
Short Caption:GOTTLIEB VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 45836 , 45952 , 46175
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0003618Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Cert/Man/Pro
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/25/2002How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/01/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Bradley Drendel & Jeanney--check no. 43651.
08/01/2001Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ. 01-13015
10/11/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. The real party in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. 01-17163
11/13/2001Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. 01-18867
12/21/2001MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Original Petition for Writ of Certiorari, Writ of Prohibition or, alternatively, Writ of Mandamus. 01-21567
01/09/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed December 21, 2001. We direct the clerk of this court to file the reply received on December 21, 2001. 02-00638
01/09/2002Petition/WritFiled Reply to Answer to Petition. Reply in Support of Original Petition for Writ of Certiorari, Writ of Prohibition, or, alternatively, Writ of Mandamus. 01-21569
02/25/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral Argument will not be scheduled and this matter shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the papers filed herein. 02-03437
02/25/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP02-MS/RR/NB
05/09/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Denying Petition for Certiorari, Mandamus or Prohibition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-08146
06/04/2002RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 02-08270
06/04/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.