judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RODNEY N. COATS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1439
Short Caption:RODNEY N. COATS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD17344-10Filed Date:11/16/2010

Opening Event Date:11/16/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/04/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/13/2011
Argued/Submitted:10/19/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/28/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRodney N. Coats YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Kathleen A. Connolly NN
Kenechukwu O. Okocha YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/16/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/03/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that William Becker, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
12/03/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) William Becker, Esquire
01/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (146pgs/Tape) 11/8/10 proc.
01/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (50pgs/Tape) 11/10/10 proc. w/CD
01/04/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/06/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)_
01/10/2011RECORD INDEX
01/10/2011RECORD COPIES
01/11/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
02/22/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 3/16/11
03/10/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before March 16, 2011. (By: JAC)
03/16/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF w/appendix attached
03/16/2011APPENDIX aplt
04/13/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
04/13/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
05/13/2011FiledFinal Screening - Regular
06/21/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of Sept 2011 through Nov 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by July 15, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
07/21/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
07/25/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
07/29/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
08/22/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
08/29/2011FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellant)
09/01/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/03/2011FiledMemorandum - from aple stating Kenechukwu Okocha will argue the case in place of Kathleen Connolly (Appellee)
10/19/2011FiledArgued before Judges Blackburne-Rigsby, Thompson, Wagner William F.X. Becker, Esq. for appellant Kenechukwu Okocha, Esq. for appellee
11/04/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Wagner, Senior Judge.)
11/28/2011FiledMandate
01/06/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)