judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 94-0303
94-0303
03/31/1994
App Writ of Error
PORT DRUM COMPANY
EVANS COOPERAGE OF HOUSTON INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/08/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/04/1994Reply to ResponseRespondent
03/31/1994Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/08/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
07/26/1994list missing briefs when case is separated(remarksDisp Ltr of 6-22-94
07/26/1994Record returned to Court of AppealsNo Mo/Re filed
06/22/1994Motion to correct disposed ofFiling grantedMotion to correct application
06/22/1994Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedAs corrected. Motion to correct app is granted.
06/06/1994Petitioner's reply brief
05/04/1994Reply to Response
04/21/1994Case forwarded to Court
04/04/1994Motion to Correct filed "Motion for leave to correct app"
04/04/1994Corrected Application for Writ of Error filed
03/31/1994Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
07/26/1994Case StoredCase stored.No Mo/Re filed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
PRAVEL, GAMBRELL HEWITTOther interested party Mr. Chris A. Stacy
ROSEN, FREDOther interested party Ms. Marian S. Rosen
PABEN, PAUL T.RespondentMr. Thomas C. Wright
DRY, N. ELTONOther interested party Mr. Chris A. Stacy
EVANS INDUSTRIES, INC.RespondentMr. Richard Frankel
EVANS, RONALD J.RespondentMs. Rita Irani
EVANS, ROBERT G.RespondentMs. Rita Irani
EVANS COOPERAGE OF HOUSTONRespondentMr. Richard B. Miller
SCHLEIN, ELMEROther interested party Ms. Marian S. Rosen
PORT DRUM COMPANYPetitionerMs. Mary M. Rawlins
Ms. Marian S. Rosen
Mr. Julius Glickman
Court of Appeals Information:
Affirmed as Modified
RULE 90, 01-13-94
14th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
215th District Court
Harris
Honorable Eugene Chambers
90-44318