judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 03-94-00165-CV
03-94-00165-CV
03/31/1994
Forfeiture
Bob Matyastik
State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/23/2004Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
10/01/1997CASE STORED
01/06/1997Leave to file motion for rehearing filedMotion or Writ Denied
06/27/1996Mandate Issued
02/29/1996Case returned from higher court
08/21/1995Case forwarded to higher court
08/11/1995Peition for Review disposed in Supreme Court
07/12/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
06/13/1995Supplement to motion filed
06/09/1995Motion for rehearing filed
05/24/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/27/1994Motion to late file statement of facts filedOverruled
10/12/1994Motion to late file statement of facts filed
10/07/1994miscellaneous motion dispOverruled
09/21/1994Supplement to motion filed
09/21/1994Response received
09/20/1994miscellaneous motion filed
09/16/1994Statement of Facts Received
09/01/1994Submitted
09/01/1994Submission
08/02/1994Brief filed
08/02/1994Case ready to be set
08/02/1994Submission
07/19/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/05/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/02/1994Amended motion disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/02/1994Brief filed
06/02/1994Mot to Consolidate Cases DispDismissed
06/02/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/17/1994Amended motion filed
05/09/1994Mot to Consolidated Case Filed
05/09/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.
05/04/1994Follow up letter regarding unpaid fee
04/11/1994Letter received
03/31/1994Transcript Filed
03/31/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/28/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
State Of TexasAppelleeThe Honorable Hollis C. Lewis Jr.
Matyastik, BobAppellantMr. Bob Matyastik
Trial Court Information
County Court
Milam
Honorable Charles E Lance
7419