judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 03-94-00155-CR
03-94-00155-CR
03/31/1994
Other Felony
Howard Wayne Chappell
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/14/1997CASE STORED
08/05/1996Mandate Issued
06/12/1996Petition for discretionary review refused
06/07/1996Case returned from higher court
06/06/1996Case forwarded to higher court
05/14/1996Peition for Review disposed in Supreme Court
04/10/1996Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
03/29/1996Motion for rehearing filed
03/13/1996Opinion issuedAffirmed as Reformed
12/01/1995Submitted
12/01/1995Submission
11/06/1995Oral argument acknowledged
11/03/1995Oral argument acknowledged
11/02/1995Oral argument acknowledged
10/27/1995Submission
02/21/1995Case ready to be set
02/21/1995Brief filed
01/26/1995Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/20/1995Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/05/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/28/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/08/1994Brief filed
11/08/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/02/1994Brief received, not filed
11/02/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/17/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/13/1994Appellant's brief overdue notice in criminal case
10/13/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/26/1994Exhibits filed
07/26/1994Statement of Facts Filed
06/07/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
05/31/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
04/13/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
04/13/1994Order Entered
04/06/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
04/04/1994Transcript Filed
03/31/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
03/31/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/05/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Chappell, Howard WayneAppellantMr. Tom Davidson
State Prosecuting AttorneyInterested partyThe Honorable Matthew W. Paul
Court Of Criminal AppealsInterested partyThe Honorable Troy C. Bennett Jr.
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasMr. Evan E. Pierce-Jones
Mr. Stephen H. Smith
Trial Court Information
119th District Court
Tom Green
CR92-0662-B
10 yrs./$10,000 (PROBATED)